Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco da Purificação da Rocha Froes, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Peking [Beijing]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1675¹BornCochin, India
169621.0ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
21 Feb 172550.1AppointedBishop of Peking [Beijing], China
16 Dec 172550.9Ordained BishopBishop of Peking [Beijing], China
31 Jul 173156.5DiedBishop of Peking [Beijing], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco da Purificação da Rocha Froes:
Bishop Francisco da Purificação da Rocha Froes O.E.S.A. (born 1675, died ) Bishop of Peking [Beijing]

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 309
  • bp/bd: CB, 25 Jul 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016