Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Álvaro de Abranches e Noronha

Deceased

Bishop of Leiria, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1661Born
19 Mar 168624.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Jun 168625.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 169433.1AppointedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
27 Dec 169433.5Ordained BishopBishop of Leiria, Portugal
8 Apr 174684.8DiedBishop of Leiria, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Álvaro de Abranches e Noronha
Bishop Álvaro de Abranches e Noronha (born , died ) Bishop of Leiria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisbon

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 51.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 241
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017