Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão

Archidioecesis Sancti Ludovici in Maragnano



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • José Belisário da Silva, O.F.M., Archbishop
  • Geraldo Dantas de Andrade, S.C.I., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 2 December 1921
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Maranho
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 13,112 (5,064 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste V
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, Avenida Dom Pedro II s/n, 65010-450 Sao Luis; C.P. 11, 65001-970, Sao Luis, MA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (098)3313-4160/7; 3313-4157
  • Fax: 3313-4158

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of São Luís do Maranhão
30 August 1677ErectedDiocese of São Luís do Maranhão (erected)
4 March 1720Territory LostDiocese of São Luís do Maranhão Diocese of Belém do Pará (erected)
20 February 1902Territory LostDiocese of São Luís do Maranhão Diocese of Piaui (erected)
Archdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão
2 December 1921ElevatedDiocese of São Luís do Maranhão Archdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão
10 February 1922Territory LostArchdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão Territorial Prelature of São José do Grajaú (erected)
10 February 1922ElevatedArchdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão (Became a Metropolitan)
22 July 1939Territory LostArchdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão Diocese of Caxias do Maranhão (erected)
22 July 1939Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of São José do Grajaú
Archdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão
Territorial Prelature of Pinheiro (erected)
30 October 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão Diocese of Viana (erected)
22 June 1968Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of São José do Grajaú
Archdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão
Diocese of Bacabal (erected)
14 September 1971Territory LostArchdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão Diocese of Brejo (erected)
26 August 1977Territory LostArchdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão Diocese of Coroatá (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão
1948780,000800,00097.5%33205314,71674543ap1951
19651,500,0001,600,00093.8%51388916,85351ap1967
1976512,000837,00061.2%17203713,837226527ap1977
1980538,000548,00098.2%21264711,4462915517ap1981
1990804,000905,00088.8%12354717,10610624926ap1991
1999821,0001,097,12274.8%5148998,29211224133ap2000
2000879,0271,172,03675.0%4249919,6596124042ap2001
2001877,0001,181,00074.3%4349929,5326124030ap2002
2002870,0001,172,03674.2%4749969,0626124031ap2003
2003887,0001,195,00074.2%4649959,3366124032ap2004
2004887,0001,195,00074.2%54491038,6115824033ap2005
2010953,0001,323,00072.0%60137313,05412322746ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 19 Jun 2013