Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio de Pádua e Bellas, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1732BornBellas, Portugal
1 Jul 175926.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
9 Apr 178350.4SelectedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
18 Jul 178350.7ConfirmedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
14 Dec 178351.1Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
28 Aug 179461.8ResignedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
21 Jan 180875.2DiedBishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio de Pádua e Bellas:
Bishop Antônio de Pádua e Bellas O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,476
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016