Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Cayetano Maciel Calheiros

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Titular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1734BornVianna
4 Apr 176732.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Aug 176733.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 178046.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
18 Sep 178046.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia
1819¹84.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Cayetano Maciel Calheiros:
Archbishop Antonio Cayetano Maciel Calheiros (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 51.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 250

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 9 Oct 2013