Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Monteiro Pereira de Azevedo

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1738³BornRezende
15 Jul 179152.8SelectedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
19 Dec 179153.2ConfirmedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
29 Apr 179253.5Ordained BishopBishop of Viseu, Portugal
3 Feb 181980.3DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Monteiro Pereira de Azevedo
Bishop Francisco Monteiro Pereira de Azevedo (born , died ) Bishop of Viseu

  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 443
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,082
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016