Bishop(s)
Suffragan Dioceses
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Diocese of Mariana | |||
6 December 1745 | Erected | Diocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro | Territorial Prelature of Cuiabá (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Goiás (erected) Diocese of Mariana (erected) Diocese of São Paulo (erected) |
6 June 1854 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Mariana | Diocese of Diamantina (erected) |
4 August 1900 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Mariana | Diocese of Pouso Alegre (erected) |
Archdiocese of Mariana | |||
1 May 1906 | Elevated | Diocese of Mariana | Archdiocese of Mariana |
18 July 1918 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Mariana
Diocese of Uberaba | Diocese of Aterrado (erected) |
11 February 1921 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Mariana | Diocese of Belo Horizonte (erected) |
1 February 1924 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Mariana | Diocese of Juiz de Fora (erected) |
28 March 1942 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Juiz de Fora (Argirita and Providenda)
Archdiocese of Mariana (Astolpho Outra, Boa Familia, Cachoeira, Cataguazes, Oonceiçao da Boa Vista, Santa Rita da Gloria, Dores de Victoria, Gloria de Muriahé, Guarany, Guirycema, Laranial, Leopoldina, Muriahé Barra, Muriahé, Palma, Patrocinio de Muriahé, Piacatuba, Pirauba, ...) | Diocese of Leopoldina (erected) |
21 May 1960 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Campanha (Carrancas, Itumirim, Itutinga, Lavras, Luminarias, Minduri, and São Vincente de Minas)
Diocese of Juiz de Fora (Andrelândia, Madre de Deus, and Piedade do Rio Grande) Archdiocese of Mariana (São João del Rei, Barroso, Dores de Campos, Lagoa Dourada, Nazareno, Prados, Rezende Costa, Tiradentes, and Bom Sucesso) | Diocese of São João del Rei (erected) |
11 November 1963 | Territory Added | Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte (Nossa Senhora da Conceiçâo, Conceiçâo do Rio Acima, and Santo Antonio de Vigario da Vara along with São Geraldo de Jacaranda and Nossa Senhora das Graças de Sesmaria) | Archdiocese of Mariana |
11 November 1963 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Mariana (São José do Paraopeba in Brumadinho; Nossa Senhora da Conceiçâo de Arrojado Lisboa and Nossa Senhora do Parto de Chacrinha in Jeceaba) | Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte |
14 June 1965 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Diamantina (Braúnas, Itambé do Mato Dentro, Morro do Pilar, Passabém, Santo Antonio do Rio Abaixo, and Sâo Sebastiâo do Rio Preto)
Archdiocese of Mariana (Alvinópolis, Antonio Dias, Bela Vista de Minas, Belo Oriente, Bom Jesus do Amparo, Coronel Fabriciano, Dionisio, Ferros, Itabira, Ipatinga, Jaguaraçu, Joanésia, Joao Monlevade, Marliéria, Mesquita, Nova Era, Rio Piracicaba, Santa Maria do Itabira, ...) | Diocese of Itabira (erected) |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Archdiocese of Mariana | ||||||||||||
1949 | 897,500 | 900,000 | 99.7% | 161 | 89 | 250 | 3,590 | 136 | 129 | 133 | ap1951 | |
1966 | 890,000 | 895,233 | 99.4% | 128 | 84 | 212 | 4,198 | 11 | 44 | 108 | ap1967 | |
1968 | 129 | 46 | 175 | 0 | 85 | 89 | ap1971* | |||||
1976 | 776,000 | 862,224 | 90.0% | 104 | 49 | 153 | 5,071 | 68 | 385 | 118 | ap1977 | |
1980 | 840,000 | 974,000 | 86.2% | 103 | 47 | 150 | 5,600 | 56 | 367 | 105 | ap1981 | |
1990 | 1,020,000 | 1,122,000 | 90.9% | 125 | 29 | 154 | 6,623 | 39 | 324 | 112 | ap1991 | |
1999 | 1,080,000 | 1,200,000 | 90.0% | 169 | 29 | 198 | 5,454 | 4 | 38 | 280 | 117 | ap2000 |
2000 | 853,432 | 1,066,791 | 80.0% | 165 | 26 | 191 | 4,468 | 5 | 34 | 286 | 119 | ap2001 |
2001 | 989,223 | 1,099,136 | 90.0% | 184 | 26 | 210 | 4,710 | 7 | 34 | 296 | 123 | ap2002 |
2002 | 879,308 | 1,099,136 | 80.0% | 185 | 28 | 213 | 4,128 | 7 | 36 | 293 | 121 | ap2003 |
2003 | 899,308 | 1,099,136 | 81.8% | 180 | 28 | 208 | 4,323 | 7 | 36 | 297 | 111 | ap2004 |
2004 | 924,266 | 1,099,136 | 84.1% | 172 | 32 | 204 | 4,530 | 8 | 40 | 300 | 122 | ap2005 |
2013 | 1,069,000 | 1,274,000 | 83.9% | 171 | 24 | 195 | 5,482 | 23 | 41 | 194 | 135 | ap2014 |
2016 | 1,080,000 | 1,242,936 | 86.9% | 168 | 25 | 193 | 5,595 | 24 | 38 | 155 | 135 | ap2017 |
2019 | 1,004,539 | 1,247,923 | 80.5% | 177 | 24 | 201 | 4,997 | 23 | 39 | 160 | 135 | ap2020 |
2021 | 1,004,481 | 1,255,601 | 80.0% | 193 | 25 | 218 | 4,607 | 36 | 40 | 159 | 136 | ap2022 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 18 Mar 2024 |
✠