Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Geraldo de Proença Sigaud, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Diamantina, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1909BornBelo Horizonte
12 Mar 193222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
29 Oct 194637.1AppointedBishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
1 May 194737.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
20 Dec 196051.2AppointedArchbishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
10 Sep 198071.0ResignedArchbishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 Sep 199989.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Geraldo de Proença Sigaud:
Archbishop Geraldo de Proença Sigaud S.V.D. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Diamantina

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 52.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013