Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Diamantina

Archidioecesis Adamantinus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 28 June 1917
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Minas Gerais
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 45,171 (17,447 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Leste II
  • Web Site: http://www.arquidiamantina.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metroplitana, C.P. 49, Rua do Contrato 104, 39100-000 Diamantina, MG, Brazil
  • Telephone: (038)3531-1094
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Diamantina
6 June 1854ErectedDiocese of Mariana Diocese of Diamantina (erected)
10 December 1910Territory LostDiocese of Diamantina Diocese of Montes Claros (erected)
25 August 1913Territory LostDiocese of Diamantina Diocese of Araçuaí (Arassuaí) (erected)
Archdiocese of Diamantina
28 June 1917ElevatedDiocese of Diamantina Archdiocese of Diamantina
16 July 1955Territory LostArchdiocese of Belo Horizonte
Archdiocese of Diamantina
Diocese of Sete Lagoas (erected)
1 February 1956Territory LostDiocese of Araçuaí (Arassuaí)
Diocese of Caratinga
Archdiocese of Diamantina
Diocese of Governador Valadares (erected)
14 June 1965Territory LostArchdiocese of Diamantina
Archdiocese of Mariana
Diocese of Itabira (erected)
24 May 1985Territory LostArchdiocese of Diamantina
Diocese of Governador Valadares
Diocese of Itabira-Fabriciano
Diocese of Guanhães (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Diamantina
1949580,367630,35092.1%5535906,448356266ap1951
1966601,200650,00092.5%6720876,91058640ap1967
1968680,000.0%6567101138ap1971
1976582,123598,53497.3%4910599,866133456ap1977
1980605,018650,02093.1%30124214,4051812042ap1981
1990524,000540,00097.0%36165210,07612011830ap1991
1999564,000587,00096.1%4765310,6411136143ap2000
2000571,000594,00096.1%5075710,0171146144ap2001
2001420,010450,60293.2%524567,5001116345ap2002
2002447,861480,48793.2%534577,8571116245ap2003
2003486,864586,58483.0%524568,6941116245ap2004
2004486,864586,58483.0%554598,2511116247ap2005
2006431,748488,00088.5%574617,077196350ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013