Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Serafim Gomes Jardim

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil

Titular Archbishop of Anasartha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1875Born
1 Jun 190125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Diamantina, Brazil
12 Mar 191438.5AppointedBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
20 Sep 191439.0Ordained BishopBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
26 May 193458.7AppointedArchbishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 Oct 195378.1RetiredArchbishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 Oct 195378.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anasartha
2 Nov 196994.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Serafim Gomes Jardim
Archbishop Serafim Gomes Jardim (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Diamantina

EventPlace
Birth PlacePimenta

  • a priest for 68.4 years
  • a bishop for 55.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 63
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast