Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manoel Joaquim Gonçalves de Andrade

Deceased

Bishop of São Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1775BornCampanario
4 Sep 179621.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Sep 179621.4Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 182752.2AppointedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
28 Oct 182752.6Ordained BishopBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
11 Nov 182752.6InstalledBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
26 May 184772.1DiedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manoel Joaquim Gonçalves de Andrade
Bishop Manoel Joaquim Gonçalves de Andrade (born , died ) Bishop of São Paulo

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 301
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jun 2016