Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop JosÚ Maria de Melo, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Faro {Algarve}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1756BornLumiar
29 Jun 177720.8ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
23 Sep 178024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
23 Apr 178730.6AppointedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
3 Jun 178730.7Ordained BishopBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
30 Mar 178932.6ResignedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
9 Jan 181861.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for JosÚ Maria de Melo:
Bishop JosÚ Maria de Melo C.O. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Faro {Algarve}

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,079

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013