Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop JosÚ Maria de Ara˙jo, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Olinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1769BornPorto
3 Mar 179222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Orden de San Jerˇnimo
27 Jan 180636.8SelectedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
6 Oct 180637.5ConfirmedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
8 Mar 180738.0Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
21 Sep 180940.5DiedBishop of Olinda, Brazil

MicroData Summary for JosÚ Maria de Ara˙jo:
Bishop JosÚ Maria de Ara˙jo O.S.H. (born , died ) Bishop of Olinda

  • a priest for 17.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013