Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José da Costa e Torres

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1741BornSetúbal
3 May 177836.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Jun 177836.8Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 178443.0SelectedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
14 Feb 178543.5ConfirmedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
1787²45.3Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
4 Jun 179654.8SelectedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
24 Jul 179755.9ConfirmedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
27 Jan 180664.4SelectedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
26 Aug 180665.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
26 Aug 181372.0DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José da Costa e Torres
Archbishop José da Costa e Torres (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 221, and Page 207
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 117
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016