Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mateus de Abreu Pereira

Deceased

Bishop of São Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1742BornMadère
1761¹18.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Aug 179451.9SelectedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
1 Jun 179552.8ConfirmedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
13 Sep 179553.0Ordained BishopBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
19 Mar 179653.6InstalledBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
5 May 182481.7DiedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mateus de Abreu Pereira
Bishop Mateus de Abreu Pereira (born , died ) Bishop of São Paulo

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016