Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José de Santa Escolástica Álvares (Alves) Pereira, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1742BornPorto
4 Apr 176725.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Apr 176725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Nov 180361.8SelectedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
26 Mar 180462.1ConfirmedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
17 Jun 180462.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
3 Jan 181471.9DiedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José de Santa Escolástica Álvares (Alves) Pereira:
Archbishop José de Santa Escolástica Álvares (Alves) Pereira O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013