Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Joaquim Da Silva

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1744BornPaparia, Portugal
18 Feb 176924.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jun 179348.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
4 Aug 179348.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
18 May 180863.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto

MicroData Summary for Manuel Joaquim Da Silva
Archbishop Manuel Joaquim Da Silva (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 66
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016