Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Maria Mascarenhas Castello Branco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1753³BornRio de Janeiro
20 May 178026.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Aug 180249.2SelectedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
20 Dec 180249.5ConfirmedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
6 Mar 180349.7Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
Apr 1807³53.8ResignedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
29 Nov 180754.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo, Angola

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Maria Mascarenhas Castello Branco:
Bishop Joaquim Maria Mascarenhas Castello Branco (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,220
  • b/ob/r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013