Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Caleppi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1741Born
1 May 177231.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 180159.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nisibis
15 Nov 180160.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nisibis
23 Dec 180160.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
8 Mar 181674.8Elevated to Cardinal
8 Mar 181674.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
10 Jan 181775.6DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Caleppi (VIAF: 61890198)
Lorenzo Cardinal Caleppi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Portugal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCervia, Diocese of Cervia, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Frascati, Suburbicarian See of Frascati, Italy
Death PlaceRio de Janeiro, Diocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
Buried Place (Original)San António, Church, Rio de Janeiro, Diocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
  • a cardinal for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1801, Number 30
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 284
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast