Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasco José a Domina Nostra de Bona Morte Lobo, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Mozambico

Titular Bishop of Olba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1757BornSão Miguel de Facha, Portugal
30 Jun 178225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
26 Jun 180548.1AppointedPrelate of Mozambico, Mozambique
26 Jun 180548.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Olba
27 Apr 180648.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olba
17 Dec 181154.5ResignedPrelate of Mozambico, Mozambique
1 Jun 182265.0DiedPrelate Emeritus of Mozambico, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Vasco José a Domina Nostra de Bona Morte Lobo:
Bishop Vasco José a Domina Nostra de Bona Morte Lobo C.R.S.A. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Mozambico

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,085
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 289

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013