Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Garampi

Deceased

Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1725BornRimini
31 May 174923.6Ordained PriestPriest
175125.2AppointedPrefect of the Vatican Secret Archives
27 Jan 177246.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Berytus
9 Feb 177246.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Berytus
20 Mar 177246.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
16 Mar 177650.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
20 May 177650.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
14 Feb 178559.3Elevated to Cardinal
3 Apr 178660.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
4 May 179266.5DiedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Garampi:
Cardinal Giuseppe Garampi (born , died ) Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
  • a cardinal for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Feb 1785

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 22 Sep 2013