Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Carafa della Spina di Traetto

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1722BornNapoli, Italy
13 Jan 176037.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Jan 176037.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 176037.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
16 Feb 176037.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
1 Mar 176037.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
Dec 1766³44.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
19 Apr 177350.9Elevated to Cardinal
26 Apr 177350.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
29 Mar 177552.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
15 Sep 178866.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
3 Aug 180785.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
20 Sep 181896.3DiedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Carafa della Spina di Traetto (VIAF: 16399040)
Francesco Cardinal Carafa della Spina di Traetto (born , died ) Prefect of Bishops and Regulars

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 58.5 years
  • a cardinal for 45.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Apr 1773
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 5
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 238

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016