Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gennaro Clemente Francone

Deceased

Bishop of Troia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1728Born
17 Apr 176839.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 177244.0AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
20 Dec 177244.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
16 Dec 179163.0SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Gaeta, Italy
27 Feb 179263.2ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Gaeta, Italy
24 Oct 179768.9SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Troia, Italy
18 Dec 179769.0ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Troia, Italy
7 May 179970.4DiedBishop of Troia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Clemente Francone
Archbishop Gennaro Clemente Francone (born , died ) Bishop of Troia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePortici

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 138, and Page 191
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 419
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,772, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast