Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Silvio di Gennaro

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1707BornSan Pietro Corpus
6 Jan 173022.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 177669.5AppointedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
21 Jul 177669.5Ordained BishopBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
12 Jul 177972.5AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
1786¹78.9DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Silvio di Gennaro:
Bishop Pietro Silvio di Gennaro (born , died 1786) Bishop of Venosa

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 290, and Page 437
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015