Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giovanni Francesco Guidi di Bagno-Talenti

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1720BornMantova
1 Apr 175232.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 177555.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
25 Mar 177555.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra
22 Sep 179575.6AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
13 Jan 179978.9DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Guidi di Bagno-Talenti
Patriarch Giovanni Francesco Guidi di Bagno-Talenti (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 87, and Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1775, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016