Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Pozzuoli

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1740BornVitolaccio
28 May 176322.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 179151.5SelectedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
27 Feb 179251.6ConfirmedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
4 Mar 179251.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
8 Mar 179958.7DiedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Pozzuoli
Bishop Paolo Pozzuoli (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 69
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016