Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Maggiolo

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1748Born
12 Sep 177325.2Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 179143.2AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
2 Oct 179143.2Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
7 Aug 180254.1DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Maggiolo
Bishop Paolo Maggiolo (born , died ) Bishop of Albenga

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto Venere

  • a priest for 28.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 74
  • ob/c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018