Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Crivelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1736BornMilano, Italy
20 Aug 177539.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 177539.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
21 Sep 177539.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
7 Dec 177539.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
12 Mar 178447.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
23 Feb 180164.7Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
29 Mar 180265.8Elevated to Cardinal
24 May 180266.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
19 Jan 181881.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna

MicroData Summary for Carlo Crivelli (VIAF: 89055301)
Carlo Cardinal Crivelli (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
  • a cardinal for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1775, Number 39
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Feb 1801
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 8 Nov 2016