Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrogio (Paulo Maria Michael) Mirelli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1730Born
19 Nov 175222.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Dec 179161.9SelectedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
27 Feb 179262.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
4 Mar 179262.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
22 Jul 179565.5DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio (Paulo Maria Michael) Mirelli
Archbishop Ambrogio (Paulo Maria Michael) Mirelli O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Chieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 400

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018