Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ottavio Boni

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazianzus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1730³BornRoma, Italy
19 Dec 177242.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 178353.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
25 Jul 178353.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
3 Mar 180878.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Boni
Archbishop Ottavio Boni (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nazianzus

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 304
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1783, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016