Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Palmieri

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1757BornMonopoli
18 Dec 177316.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 179740.0SelectedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
29 Jan 179840.3ConfirmedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
2 Feb 179840.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
29 Oct 180447.0AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
22 Mar 182466.4SelectedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
3 May 182466.5ConfirmedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
24 Nov 184285.1DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Palmieri
Bishop Michele Palmieri (born , died ) Bishop of Monopoli

  • a priest for 68.9 years
  • a bishop for 44.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1843
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,968
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 297
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 269, and Page 379
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016