Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabrizio Cimino, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1733BornSalerno
16 Jul 175219.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
13 Mar 175622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
24 Oct 179764.5SelectedBishop of Oria, Italy
29 Jan 179864.8ConfirmedBishop of Oria, Italy
2 Feb 179864.8Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
22 Mar 181884.9DiedBishop of Oria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Cimino
Bishop Fabrizio Cimino C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Oria

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,968
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 11
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 427

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016