Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Alcaini, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1748Born
15 Aug 177224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
14 Feb 178536.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belluno, Italy
14 Feb 178536.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
20 Feb 178536.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia
26 Sep 178537.1AppointedBishop of Belluno, Italy
4 Mar 180354.5DiedBishop of Belluno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Alcaini
Bishop Sebastiano Alcaini C.R.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Belluno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 90, and Page 120
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,785, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast