Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Maria Molin

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1753Born
20 Dec 177724.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 178531.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
24 Aug 180753.7AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
16 Apr 181965.4DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Maria Molin (VIAF: 15676039)
Bishop Federico Maria Molin (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 41.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 59
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 90
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018