Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Benedetto Maria Ciuran (Civran)

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1723Born
8 Jun 174824.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 176945.5SelectedBishop of Caorle, Italy
6 Aug 177046.6ConfirmedBishop of Caorle, Italy
12 Aug 177046.6Ordained BishopBishop of Caorle, Italy
8 Jun 177652.5SelectedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
15 Jul 177652.6ConfirmedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
28 Oct 179470.9DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Benedetto Maria Ciuran (Civran)
Bishop Giovanni Benedetto Maria Ciuran (Civran) (born , died ) Bishop of Chioggia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBassano

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 146, and Page 170
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,696
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1770, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Jan 2018