Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Niccol˛ Angelo Sagredo

Deceased

Bishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1728Born
8 Dec 177749.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Dec 177749.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 178657.8SelectedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
10 Mar 178859.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
13 Apr 178859.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Udine, Italy
15 Mar 179263.4SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Torcello (Turris), Italy
18 Jun 179263.7ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Torcello (Turris), Italy
16 Aug 180475.9DiedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ Angelo Sagredo
Archbishop Niccol˛ Angelo Sagredo (born , died ) Bishop of Torcello (Turris)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 26.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,463
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 410, and Page 428
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1788, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018