Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Udine

Archidioecesis Utinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Andrea Bruno Mazzocato, Archbishop
  • Pietro Brollo, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

(none)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Archdiocese of Udine
6 July 1751ErectedArchdiocese of Udine (erected)
Diocese of Udine
1 May 1818ElevatedArchdiocese of Udine Diocese of Udine (Archdiocese to Diocese)
Archdiocese of Udine
14 March 1847ElevatedDiocese of Udine Archdiocese of Udine

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Udine
1950534,750535,000100.0%819829015932151,245488ap1951
1969497,600497,812100.0%739958345961251,363406ap1971
1980501,357508,47098.6%60211271470211531,015487ap1981
1990480,550495,55097.0%518555738381083891373ap1991
1999478,500488,00098.1%4129550794314121787373ap2000
2000477,900488,00097.9%4059049596515116777373ap2001
2001478,000488,00098.0%3969549197314120767373ap2002
2002478,000488,00098.0%3849547999714120757373ap2003
2003478,000488,50097.9%367904571,04516115757373ap2004
2004478,000488,50097.9%348904381,09116115757373ap2005
2010484,898505,01896.0%316823981,2182199506374ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 5 Jul 2013