Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Cappellari

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1819Born
17 Dec 184223.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 187253.0AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
23 Jun 187253.1Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
22 Apr 1881³61.9ResignedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
6 May 188162.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
20 Aug 190182.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Cappellari (VIAF: 90204555)
Bishop Pietro Cappellari (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Concordia (Sagittaria)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDogna, Archdiocese of Udine
Ordained BishopCathedral, Udine, Archdiocese of Udine

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 221, and Page 237
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1872, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Mar 2017