Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Corradino Cavriani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ceneda, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Adana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1810Born
6 Oct 183929.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187161.6AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
5 Nov 187161.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ceneda, Italy
11 Feb 188574.9ResignedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
27 Mar 188575.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Adana
27 Jan 189079.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Ceneda, Italy

MicroData Summary for Corradino Cavriani
Archbishop Corradino Cavriani (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ceneda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantova
Ordained BishopSantissima TrinitÓ dei Monti, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 74, and Page 194
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1871, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Mar 2017