Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Giovanni Battista Bolognesi, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1814Born
4 Jan 183217.9ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
17 Dec 183622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
27 Oct 187157.7AppointedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
10 Dec 187157.8Ordained BishopBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
6 Jan 187257.9InstalledBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
29 Jan 189984.9DiedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Giovanni Battista Bolognesi
Bishop Salvatore Giovanni Battista Bolognesi C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Belluno e Feltre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSte Marie de la Consolation, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 146
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017