Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Luigi Cardinal Trevisanato

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1801Born
13 Mar 182423.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 185251.0AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
26 May 185251.2SelectedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
27 Sep 185251.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
16 Jan 185351.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Udine, Italy
17 Jan 186260.9SelectedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
7 Apr 186261.1ConfirmedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
16 Mar 186362.0Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 186463.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
28 Apr 187776.2DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Luigi Trevisanato (VIAF: 27853604)
Giuseppe Luigi Cardinal Trevisanato (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMogliano Veneto
Ordained BishopVallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
  • a cardinal for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 577, and Page 584
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 587, and Page 51
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1853, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017