Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Casasola

Deceased

Archbishop of Udine, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1806Born
18 Dec 183024.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Mar 183124.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 185549.0SelectedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
17 Dec 185549.3ConfirmedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
18 May 185649.7Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
22 Jan 186356.4SelectedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
28 Sep 186357.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
12 Aug 188477.9DiedArchbishop of Udine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Casasola (VIAF: 90401184)
Archbishop Andrea Casasola (born , died ) Archbishop of Udine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuja, Archdiocese of Udine
Ordained BishopChurch of the Italians, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 221, and Page 577
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1856, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Mar 2017