Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomeo Carlo Romilli

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1795BornBergamo
31 May 181722.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Dec 181722.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 184550.6SelectedBishop of Cremona, Italy
19 Jan 184650.8ConfirmedBishop of Cremona, Italy
21 Jun 184651.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
10 Apr 184752.1SelectedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
14 Jun 184752.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
5 Sep 184752.5InstalledArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
7 May 185964.1DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Carlo Romilli:
Archbishop Bartolomeo Carlo Romilli (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 376
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013