Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giovanni Pietro Aurelio Mutti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1775BornBorgo di Terzo
23 Sep 179722.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Dec 179924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Aug 184064.9SelectedBishop of Verona, Italy
14 Dec 184065.2ConfirmedBishop of Verona, Italy
18 Jul 184165.8Ordained BishopBishop of Verona, Italy
15 Mar 185276.5AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
9 Apr 185781.5DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pietro Aurelio Mutti
Patriarch Giovanni Pietro Aurelio Mutti O.S.B. (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1842
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 584
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 394
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1841, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Dec 2016