Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Verona

Dioecesis Veronensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Domenico Pompili, Bishop
  • Giuseppe Zenti, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 3rd Century
  • Metropolitan: Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 3,053 (1,179 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Triveneto
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesiverona.it/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Vescovile, Piazza Vescovado 7, 37121 Verona, Italia
  • Telephone: 045.80.83.711
  • Fax: 045.80.83.782

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Verona (erected)
6 July 1751Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Verona (from Aquileia to Udine)
17 September 1977Territory AddedDiocese of Mantova (Pampuro in Sorga) Diocese of Verona
17 September 1977Territory LostDiocese of Verona (Castellaro Lagusello, Monzambano, and Ponti sul Mincio (in Monzambano and Ponti sul Mincio)) Diocese of Mantova
8 August 2014Territory LostDiocese of Verona (Caselle di Pressana in Pressana (VR)) Diocese of Vicenza

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1886400,446.0%9800264OTC
1950645,159645,402100.0%6792369157054223,280319ap1951
1970713,513717,61399.4%7144811,1955976813,439368ap1971
1980757,337778,33097.3%6954601,15565537783,940379ap1981
1990771,500799,82996.5%7204701,190648136853,635379ap1991
1999758,000787,66896.2%7354381,173646186252,650381ap2000
2000750,000828,27990.5%7154001,115672186112,570381ap2001
2001750,000829,00090.5%6914001,091687186942,490381ap2002
2002785,000845,92692.8%6954001,095716185902,534381ap2003
2003778,000837,94892.8%7003801,080720186012,300381ap2004
2004775,000845,02191.7%6893701,059731185741,953380ap2005
2010843,229923,83091.3%649347996846315222,240381ap2011
2014847,171933,78290.7%622330952889375252,052379ap2015
2017869,384940,28992.5%606352958907444801,862380ap2018
2020866,523947,35391.5%580328908954424361,746380ap2021

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 522, and Page 523
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 265
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 331
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 365
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 411
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 438, and Page 439
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 393, and Page 394
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 587
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 391
  • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 804, to Page 806
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 69, Page 679, and Page 680

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 21 Feb 2024