Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicol˛ Ormanetto

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}

Apostolic Nuncio to Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jul 1570AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
1 Aug 1570Ordained BishopBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
1 Jul 1572AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
18 Jun 1577DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicol˛ Ormanetto (VIAF: 89073565)
Bishop Nicol˛ Ormanetto (died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 267
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 17, Number 63
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 277

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Oct 2016