Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino Maria Pontalti, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hvar (Lesina)

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1709¹BornVerona
24 Jun 173122.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
23 Nov 176152.8AppointedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
3 Jan 176253.0Ordained BishopBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
6 Apr 176758.2ResignedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
13 Apr 176758.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
19 Jul 177263.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Maria Pontalti:
Bishop Gioacchino Maria Pontalti O. Carm. (born 1709, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hvar (Lesina)

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 101, and Page 336
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015