Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pietro Riboli

Deceased

Bishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1717Born
24 Sep 174124.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 176749.9AppointedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
12 Jul 176749.9Ordained BishopBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
30 Dec 178366.3DiedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pietro Riboli
Bishop Giovanni Pietro Riboli (born , died ) Bishop of Hvar (Lesina)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClisae

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 336
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast