Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Ottavio Cardinal Bufalini

Deceased

Bishop of Ancona e Numana

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1709BornCittà di Castello
17 Nov 175445.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 175445.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
21 Dec 175445.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
21 Jul 176657.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Aug 176657.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
1 Dec 176657.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ancona e Numana, Italy
3 Aug 178273.5DiedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Ottavio Bufalini:
Cardinal Giovanni Ottavio Bufalini (born , died ) Bishop of Ancona e Numana

  • a priest for 27.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
  • a cardinal for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Jul 1766
  • c2+: CB, 20 Jun 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013