Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnaldo Speroni, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1727Born
19 Dec 175022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Jun 176638.4AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
8 Jun 176638.4Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
2 Nov 180072.8DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Arnaldo Speroni
Bishop Arnaldo Speroni O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Birth PlacePadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 66
  • c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast